ROPER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526428
Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Anne Rigby Trustee 15 September 2018 None on record
MARTIN JOHN HOTHERSALL Trustee None on record
JOHN WHITTLE Trustee
GUILD INITIATIVE FOR FURNITURE TRUST Received: On time
REV Paul Mervyl Fletcher Chair 01 August 2017 None on record
David Eastham Trustee 24 October 2014 None on record
Councillor Dorothy Jennifer Mein Trustee 15 June 2017
EMMAUS PRESTON Received: On time
Anne Maria Hall Trustee 18 June 2013 None on record