BLESSED TRINITY R.C. COLLEGE PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 526620
Charity reporting is overdue by 782 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 51 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 416 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 416 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 782 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 782 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 August 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required