Financial history CHARITIES I C W COWLEY LANGUAGE COLLEGE

Charity number: 526708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £543 £405 £393 £333 £291
Total expenditure £0 £405 £798 £1.12k £291
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A