Financial history LONGCAKE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £5.79k £6.20k £6.19k £6.32k £6.44k
Total expenditure £5.80k £6.02k £6.41k £6.33k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A