Dogfen lywodraethu RICHARDSON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 6 SEPTEMBER 1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 8 FEBRUARY 1896, 8 NOVEMBER 1898, 23 JUNE 1932 AND 29 AUGUST 1956
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. MAINTENANCE OF A VOLUNTARY PRIMARY SCHOOL 2. PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR THE RICHARDSON ENDOWED PRIMARY SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 3. ASSISTANCE OF BOYS AND GIRLS RESIDENT IN THE FORMER TOWNSHIPS OF SMALLY HEANOR AND HORSLEY WOODHOUSE OR WHO ATTENDED THE SAID SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS. TO OBTAIN FURTHER EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.
Maes buddion
FORMER TOWNSHIPS OF SMALLEY HEANOR AND HORSLEY WOODHOUSE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.