Financial history ST. WYSTAN'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 527181
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £806.16k £816.00k £774.53k £788.48k £767.68k
Total expenditure £810.72k £813.75k £802.90k £758.64k £813.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £48.34k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £6.61k £11.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £756.46k
Income - Charitable activities £806.16k £815.99k £774.50k £733.52k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3 £9 £28 £12 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £48.34k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £810.72k £813.75k £802.90k £758.64k £813.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.33k £5.25k £3.88k £14.78k £46.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0