Financial history THE LADY HAWKINS'S SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 527251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £22.84k £14.76k £29.44k £23.12k £14.46k
Total expenditure £25.33k £20.18k £30.59k £32.81k £7.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A