THE LLOYD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.06k £18.28k £19.76k £19.99k £20.37k
Total expenditure £5.48k £15.75k £23.28k £15.97k £16.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A