THE LLOYD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 527455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELAINE BELL Chair None on record
ELIZABETH LEWIS Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
Peter Reynolds Trustee 23 October 2019 None on record
RODNEY REYNOLDS Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
ANN M STARR Trustee 18 October 2021 None on record
Dr Pinky Jain Trustee 25 January 2021
WORCESTER SAMARITANS Received: On time
PAUL W J ADAMS Trustee 30 December 2012 None on record
DAVID LINNEY Trustee None on record
Heather Barningham Trustee 02 October 2013 None on record