SAMUEL EDWARDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR STAMFORD

Charity number: 527644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £911 £694 £744 £719 £0
Total expenditure £498 £0 £129 £17.03k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A