Trustees THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL DAY BEAUMONT CBE Chair
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Cllr Jay Henderson Trustee 12 June 2019
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
James Baggaley Trustee 12 June 2019
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
David Saxelby Trustee 04 June 2019
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
Irene Brown Trustee 01 May 2019
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew Jonathan Fearn Trustee 20 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWARK ON TRENT ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST LEONARD
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
NEWARK CRUSADER CIO
Received: On time
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Cllr Stuart Wallace Trustee 27 September 2011
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
JAMES HOWLETT Trustee
NEWARK EMMAUS TRUST
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
GRAHAM CARTLEDGE Trustee
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
JAMES DERRY Trustee
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
MICHAEL FURNESS QC Trustee
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
RICHARD WATKINSON Trustee
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time