NEWARK PREPARATORY SCHOOL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 528261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 17 December 2015 On time Download