Financial history SHREWSBURY SCHOOL

Charity number: 528413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £25.05m £26.67m £27.05m £34.21m £30.84m
Total expenditure £22.72m £24.21m £25.11m £27.93m £28.27m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £707.98k £400.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £876.93k £1.41m £885.59k £5.77m £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities £1.22m £1.53m £1.94m £1.48m £1.38m
Income - Charitable activities £22.83m £23.59m £24.12m £26.16m £26.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £25.85k £0
Income - Investment £115.22k £126.56k £111.34k £122.32k £106.77k
Income - Other £11.40k £11.00k £0 £707.98k £1.29m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £610.52k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.37m £22.69m £23.40m £26.29m £26.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.04m £1.52m £1.71m £1.64m £1.32m
Expenditure - Governance £119.98k £143.20k £339.51k £142.86k £192.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £21.40k £21.90k £22.32k £25.34k
Expenditure - Other £315.98k £0 £0 £0 £0