SHREWSBURY SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Pitt Chair 14 June 2018
SHREWSBURY SCHOOL Received: On time
Dominic Perks Trustee 10 June 2020
THE BIG ASK FOUNDATION Recently registered
Michael Clifford Kerr BA, ACMA Trustee 24 September 2009 None on record
Mr J Dickson Trustee 19 May 2017 None on record
TIMOTHY HAYNES Trustee 28 November 2018
RWANDA ACTION Received: On time
Mr JCR Arthur Trustee 20 November 2014 None on record
Eliza Garner Hodgson Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
Andrew Haining Trustee 14 June 2018 None on record
Eleanor May Parfitt Gurden Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
James Edward Michael Cross QC Trustee 02 November 2011 None on record