Governing document MIDLAND GROUP TRAINING SERVICES LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JULY 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 OCTOBER 1974, 17 SEPTEMBER 1975, 20 SEPTEMBER 1978, 12 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 11 NOVEMBER 1998 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 APR 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE THEORETICAL AND PRACTICAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS ENGAGED OR INTENDING TO BE ENGAGED IN ENGINEERING, GENERAL INDUSTRIAL AND COMMERCIAL ACTIVITIES. (B) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE TO THE TRAINING OR EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN CONNECTION WITH ENGINEERING, GENERAL INDUSTRIAL AND COMMERCIAL ACTIVITIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.