THE AMPLEFORTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 529626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £88.27k £90.11k £92.00k £92.52k £77.78k
Total expenditure £94.27k £92.88k £97.53k £100.37k £88.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A