AINTHORPE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 529690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Michael Anderson Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
CAROLINE BARBER Chair None on record
Craig Sewell Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
Jean Blacklock Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
LIZ SMITH Trustee 11 September 2017 None on record
Sally Wilson Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
KATE SMITH Trustee 11 January 2013 None on record
PAMELA SHEPHERD Trustee None on record