Trustees SHELDON MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity number: 529733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Francis Michael Willis | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Ian Tuckley | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Young | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Robert Brannan | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Dorothy Arkell Nott | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Bardsea Miller | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita June Freedman | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Sheils M.A. | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER VINCENT ADDYMAN CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID JOHN FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.