HESSLEWOOD CHILDREN'S TRUST (HULL SEAMEN'S AND GENERAL ORPHANAGE)

Charity number: 529804
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 October 2016 On time Download