HESSLEWOOD CHILDREN'S TRUST (HULL SEAMEN'S AND GENERAL ORPHANAGE)

Charity number: 529804
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £92.30k £108.50k £112.45k £121.33k £116.86k
Total expenditure £98.58k £120.96k £110.09k £115.58k £102.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A