THE BRONTE SOCIETY

Charity number: 529952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elina Eady Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Helen Clare Meller Trustee 09 June 2018 None on record
Laura Joanne Beare Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Ciara Martina Gallagher Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Anne Powell Trustee 08 June 2019 None on record
Shahidha Kazi Bari Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Professor Valerie Ruth Sanders Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Julian Mark Sladdin Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Dr Jonathan Roy Gration Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
Penelope Anna Jenkins Trustee 05 September 2021 None on record
ANDREW MIDGLEY Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Patricia Gurney Trustee 11 June 2016 None on record