Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JACOB HENRY MOSES ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 209723-37
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES DATED 24 OCTOBER 1922 AND 3 FEBRUARY 1933 AND 26 OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR WIDOWS OR SINGLE WOMEN OF THE JEWISH FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 22 January 1963: Standard registration
- 24 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 24 March 2009: Funds transferred to 802559 JEWISH CARE
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.