THE BLACKHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download