Trustees THE BLACKHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 700295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Owens | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jen Linford | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Kelly | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Kieron Johnson | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|||||
June Appleton | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|||||
ROBERT WAITE | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|||||
CAROLE LESLIE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.