Financial history KNUTSFORD COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 700401
Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £529 £440 £120 £0 £0
Total expenditure £127 £107 £113 £4.09k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A