Financial history SOUTH WYE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.36k £28.04k £26.31k £27.36k £12.26k
Total expenditure £33.66k £18.67k £23.93k £23.90k £11.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £8.50k £5.75k £6.92k £6.00k