Trustees THE ROBERT STEPHENSON TRUST
Charity number: 700647
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Leslie Heath | Chair | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Langham | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm C Reed CBE | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Christopher Reed | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Martin Benham | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hugh Fenwick | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
F Philip Wiltshire | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Brown | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HAWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES MICHAEL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.