Dogfen lywodraethu FURNITURE RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/09/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/2014 as amended on 24 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND BY PROVIDING GUIDANCE FOR SUCH PEOPLE AS ARE IN NEED CALCULATED TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING. 3) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING,THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED,IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE AND THE NORTH WEST REGION
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.