Financial history FRIENDS OF THE NEWARK ACADEMY

Charity number: 700800
Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £868 £1.37k £2.84k £2.58k £1.29k
Total expenditure £1.62k £529 £2.58k £2.49k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A