Trustees ALTRINCHAM ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Charity number: 701165
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WRIGHT | Chair | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Leigh | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Melling | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Monica Brady | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maldwyn Timms | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Poyner | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA ROSMOND BAGLEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR ALEXANDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MARIE MOONEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.