Accounts and annual returns EISTEDDFOD Y GROGLITH, DINAS MAWDDWY COMMITTEE

Charity number: 701204
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required