Financial history EISTEDDFOD Y GROGLITH, DINAS MAWDDWY COMMITTEE

Charity number: 701204
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £1.56k £2.14k £900 £359 £0
Total expenditure £1.57k £1.73k £15 £15 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A