ST ANN'S PARISH CHARITY

Charity number: 701319
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £48.09k £41.40k £35.27k £37.88k £38.88k
Total expenditure £43.76k £39.33k £45.45k £36.43k £39.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A