MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 701557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required