MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 701557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.27k £3.45k £3.72k £2.48k £3.28k
Total expenditure £2.92k £2.90k £3.60k £2.93k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A