Accounts and annual returns THE JACK PATSTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 701658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 15 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 23 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window