Financial history THE JACK PATSTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 701658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £115.77k £122.04k £122.83k £122.74k £111.27k
Total expenditure £109.22k £134.16k £131.08k £147.37k £103.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A