Belle Isle Senior Action - BISA

Charity number: 701895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Lock Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Colin Robinson Trustee 07 January 2020 None on record
JEAN BURTON Trustee None on record
Michael John Griffiths Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
DOT SEARCY Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
JOYCE APPLEYARD Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
Patricia Gregg Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
David Geldard Trustee 24 October 2018 None on record
Antony John Larvin Chair 24 October 2018 None on record
MARGARET BROWN Trustee None on record