Accounts and annual returns OXYGEN & WELLNESS THERAPY CENTRE

Charity number: 701924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window