THE LABOUCHERE TRUST

Charity number: 702003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £4.36k £4.73k £5.20k £5.51k £5.52k
Total expenditure £1.69k £4.05k £4.69k £5.40k £5.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A