Trustees PEWTERSPEAR GREEN TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 702068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHIL PEGUM | Chair | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dennis John Buckley | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Marshall | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR JUDITH WHEELER | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hartland | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALAN JEWELL | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD THOMAS JOHNSON | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROWLAND BLACKSTOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH NEALE LLB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.