Trustees DENBY LADIES (SENIOR CITIZENS) COMMITTEE

Charity number: 702116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUNE COOK Chair 05 September 2011
None on record
Barbara Conlon Mrs Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record
Pam KIng Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record
Annabelle Emery Trustee 16 February 2022
None on record
Christine Lawrence Trustee 17 September 2015
None on record
Diane Patricia Brown ms Trustee 30 October 2014
None on record
Christine Figg Trustee 14 April 2011
None on record
Cynthia Wynne Trustee
None on record
Kathy Fletcher Trustee
None on record
Fiona Crossley Trustee
None on record
Susan Swithenbank Trustee
None on record
Kathleen Coupe Trustee
None on record
Susan Sharpe Trustee
None on record