THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (LEEDS) GENERAL PURPOSE FUND

Charity number: 702118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.90k £10.28k £10.21k £10.59k £7.83k
Total expenditure £13.12k £7.07k £11.17k £12.38k £5.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A