THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (LEEDS) GENERAL PURPOSE FUND

Charity number: 702118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Robinson Trustee 02 October 2017
ST ANDREW'S ROUNDHAY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
Peter Craske Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
Rev Pauline Calderwood Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
MAX EDWARD RICHARD DUDLEY Chair
UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE LEEDS Received: On time
PAULINE PEACOCK Trustee 10 January 2017
LEEDS SOUTH AND WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Alexandra Margaret Jowitt Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
MR Michael Rhodes Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record