DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 702419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £477.22k £502.36k £592.64k £674.86k £882.60k
Total expenditure £481.54k £484.70k £571.05k £680.14k £883.13k
Income from government contracts £146.76k £176.43k £57.87k £168.47k £156.72k
Income from government grants £260.46k £216.27k £168.27k £217.94k £471.75k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £305.93k £408.88k £867 £687.61k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £192.31k £179.80k £205.06k £193.63k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £50 £62 £46 £33
Income - Other N/A £4.07k £3.90k £2.56k £1.34k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £407.65k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £482.28k £566.83k £678.83k £876.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £2.42k £4.22k £1.32k £6.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.25k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0