DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 702419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mick Wilson Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Jose Mary Rodgers Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
JOHN DUNCAN Trustee None on record
JULIE SKILL Trustee 02 November 2016 None on record
ANGELA MARGARET SUSANNE WEBSTER LCCMD Trustee 04 September 2018
DERBYSHIRE UNEMPLOYED WORKERS' CENTRES Received: On time
MICHAEL GORDON Trustee None on record
Elaine Tidd Trustee 24 July 2019
DERBYSHIRE UNEMPLOYED WORKERS' CENTRES Received: On time
Robert William Busby Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
DERRICK SKINNER Trustee 02 June 2016 None on record
Jack Woolley Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
HOWARD BORRELL Trustee 18 November 2015
LOUNDSLEY GREEN COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
THE CHESTERFIELD/TSUMEB TRUST Received: On time
DAVID ROLAND SHAW Trustee 24 January 2013 None on record
Philip Rose Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Duncan McGregor Trustee 27 February 2019
THE CRESWELL HERITAGE TRUST Received: 100 days late
Sasha Lawrence Trustee 30 June 2021 None on record
COLIN HAMPTON Trustee 12 November 2014
DERBYSHIRE ASBESTOS SUPPORT TEAM Received: On time
JENNY FLOOD Trustee 10 February 2012 None on record
ALAN ANDREW POWELL Trustee 01 July 2019
THE DRONFIELD HERITAGE TRUST Received: 1 day late
Alan Craw Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
SARAH WHITE Trustee 28 January 2016 None on record