Trustees U3A CHEPSTOW GROUP
Charity number: 702771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Fishpool | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Daphne Le Fevre | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Davies | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laraine Golding | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Channing | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Gene Gregory | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Harrison | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cathryn Broughton | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Allard | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Peter Kenneth Hutton | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Eileen Davies | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joy Lee | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.