BILTON GRANGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702986
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tony Parker Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record
John Wood Trustee 12 November 2012 None on record
Adam Sellers Trustee 01 November 2015 None on record
SUSAN MORLAND-DARBOE Trustee
NORTHERN HULL COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT LIMITED Received: On time
PETER STEWART WADFORTH Trustee None on record
COLIN NICHOLS Chair 01 April 2014
KINGSTON UPON HULL GATEWAY CLUB Received: On time
Rev Dave Rodgers Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record