BUGBROOKE OR 29TH MAY CHARITY

Charity number: 201486-6
Removed charity
Governing document
INDENTURES DATED 1 JANUARY 1755 AND 2 JANUARY 1755. SCHEMES OF 4 FEBRUARY 1879 AND 30 JULY 1915 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
CLOTHING FOR POOR FREEMEN OF THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON.
Area of benefit
No information available
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 12 June 1962 : registered
  • 01 December 2011 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (S.74))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of
What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available