Financial history THE SIR JOHN GIELGUD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £78.70k £70.60k £76.19k £70.47k £59.86k
Total expenditure £144.10k £139.50k £144.78k £148.85k £157.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A